MD HB1081 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a holder of a Class BH alcoholic beverages license in Prince George's County that obtains a special entertainment permit to allow an individual under the age of 21 years to be present on the licensed premises while alcoholic beverages are being served during specified events; altering a definition; and making a stylistic change.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Permit - Class BH Licensees PG 301-13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {863993/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Circuit Courts
Fees
Hearings
Hotels and Motels
Law Enforcement
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Youth
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Circuit Courts
Fees
Hearings
Hotels and Motels
Law Enforcement
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Youth