MD HB1076 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Energy-Generating Cooperative Advisory Committee; providing for the credit structure for the energy generated from an energy-generating cooperative; specifying the duties of the Committee; requiring the Committee to present a report to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015, including information regarding energy-generating cooperatives and the most efficient, cost-effective, and environmentally sound methods for utilizing poultry litter; etc.
Title
Energy-Generating Cooperative Advisory Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313890/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Alternative Energy Sources
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Cooperative Associations
Energy Matters
Legislative Services, Department of
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Alternative Energy Sources
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Cooperative Associations
Energy Matters
Legislative Services, Department of
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation