MD HB1048 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an exemption from the Prince George's County school facilities surcharge for multi-family housing designated as student housing in a specified area within the campus of Capitol College and for single family attached dwelling units in specified residential projects within the Developed Tier.
Title
Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge Exemption - Capitol College Student Housing and Residential Revitalization Projects PG 408-14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {760819/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Construction
Counties - Local Laws
Development Fees and Taxes
Exemptions
Higher Education
Housing
Local Government Mandates
Prince George's County
Public Schools
Students
Counties - Local Laws
Development Fees and Taxes
Exemptions
Higher Education
Housing
Local Government Mandates
Prince George's County
Public Schools
Students