MD HB1 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB255
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring producers of architectural paint or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment by July 1, 2025, and in accordance with certain requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve certain plans, including a certain assessment; prohibiting the sale of certain architectural paint beginning January 1, 2026 unless an approved Paint Stewardship Program has been implemented by certain producers; etc.
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsors
Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] |
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] | Del. Jen Terrasa [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Floor Amendment 403322/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Floor Amendment 663129/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (Y: 34 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Floor Amendment 403322/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Floor Amendment 663129/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (Y: 34 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-11) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-37) |
2024-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-21 | House | Floor Amendment {403322/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (35-99) |
2024-02-21 | House | Floor Amendment {663129/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (34-98) |
2024-02-20 | House | Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
2023-10-03 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB255 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (35-12)
SB325 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
SB325 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Home Improvement
Industry and Technology
internet
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Privacy
Public Information
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Transportation
Weights and Measures
Wholesale Distribution
Auditors and Audits
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Home Improvement
Industry and Technology
internet
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Privacy
Public Information
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Transportation
Weights and Measures
Wholesale Distribution
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1733 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1734 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |