MD HB1 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the juvenile court to inquire as to the educational stability of a child at specified hearings and proceedings; and authorizing the juvenile court to consider specified factors in determining the educational stability of a child.
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-3) (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-3) (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-3) |
2014-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-11-12 | House | Pre-filed |