MA S791 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3929
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H3929
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H3929
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to control infection in nursing facilities. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to infection control in nursing facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Rodney Elliott [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-30 | House | Accompanied H3929 |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S397 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2363 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H640 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3929 (Replaced by) 2023-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4178
S2363 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H640 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3929 (Replaced by) 2023-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4178
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S791 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S791.pdf |