MA S34 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2771
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a comprehensive statewide policy concerning streaming entertainment services and the recovery of municipal costs for the management and maintenance of digital infrastructure. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
To modernize funding for community media programming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2771 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 6, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
Same As/Similar To
H4560 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4615 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - See H3911
S2771 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4623 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4615 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - See H3911
S2771 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4623 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S34 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S34.pdf |