MA S27 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4382
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to foster care children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to children in the care, protection and custody of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4382 |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-07-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-04-29 | House | House concurred |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday June 13, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4382 (Replaced by) 2014-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S27 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S27.pdf |