MA S2418 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2334
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to extend voting protection to early voting, reports the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2418).
Title
Order relative to authorizing the joint committee on Election Laws to make an investigation and study of a certain current Senate document relative to early voting
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied by S2334 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S2334 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2418
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S276 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S276 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2418 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2418.pdf |