MA S2396 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt the town of Tewksbury from the provisions of the civil service law with regard to the recruitment and hiring of full-time permanent police officers. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting the town of Tewksbury from the provisions of the civil service law with regard to the recruitment and hiring of full-time permanent police officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-12 | House | House concurred |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2416 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2024
H4028 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H4041 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4238 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H4526 (Similar To) 2024-04-12 - Hearing scheduled for 04/17/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4028 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H4041 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4238 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H4526 (Similar To) 2024-04-12 - Hearing scheduled for 04/17/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2396 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2396.pdf |