MA S2173 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1110
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 489 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 489 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to missing persons (Senate, No. 1110), reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2173).
Title
Relative to missing persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 489 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Senate concurred to House amendment |
2015-01-06 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-30 | House | Amendments adopted, as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-07-30 | House | Read second |
2014-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendments pending |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with amendments and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendments pending |
2014-06-09 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #348 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Read third |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S1110 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S1110 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1110 (Replaces) 2014-06-05 - New draft substituted, see S2173
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2173 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2173.pdf |