MA S2131 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 470 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 470 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Sunderland to continue the employment of James P. Bielunis as a call firefighter. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Sunderland to continue the employment of James P. Bielunis as a call firefighter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 470 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-06 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-01-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-01-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-01-06 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Read third and engrossed |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Public Service |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR 10) |
2014-05-12 | House | House concurred |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2131 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2131.pdf |