MA S2002 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 497 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 497 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to direct the city of Boston Police Department to waive the maximum age requirement for police officer Edward Grace. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Directing the police department of the city of Boston to waive the maximum age requirement for police officer Edward Grace
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 497 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-06 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-05-28 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-02-24 | House | House concurred |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2002 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2002.pdf |