MA S1793 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to permit town resident, Evens Maurice, to apply and be considered for appointment to the position of police officer in the town of Arlington. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To permit town resident, Evens Maurice, to apply and be considered for appointment to the position of police officer in the town of Arlington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-06-12 | House | House concurred |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1793 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1793.pdf |