MA S1686 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to civil service. Public Service.
Title
Relative to civil service
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S575 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H3053 (Similar To) 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H2104 (Similar To) 2023-10-09 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H3053 (Similar To) 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H2104 (Similar To) 2023-10-09 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1686 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1686.pdf |