MA S1659 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to classify municipal animal control officers in group 4. Public Service.
Title
Classifying municipal animal control officers in group 4
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1321 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
S2536 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4271 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2536 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4271 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1659 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1659.pdf |