MA S1650 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to retirement benefits for care givers at the Soldiers' Homes. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for care givers at the Soldiers' Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2527 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1650 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1650.pdf |