MA S1510 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect the civil rights and safety of all Massachusetts residents. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To protect the civil rights and safety of all Massachusetts residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-12 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/22/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2024-01-11 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/22/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2024-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4114 (Similar To) 2023-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H4552 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
H4114 (Similar To) 2023-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H4552 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1510 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1510.pdf |