MA S1503 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the disclosure of certain police reports. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Regulating access to the disclosure of certain police reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2557 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4268 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4527 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Ordered to a third reading
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2557 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4268 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4527 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1503 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1503.pdf |