MA S1502 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce certain toxic chemicals in firefighter personal protective equipment. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the reduction of certain toxic chemicals in firefighter personal protective equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1556 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H4535 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Senate concurred
H4561 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4535 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Senate concurred
H4561 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1502 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1502.pdf |