MA S1478 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further define fraud in public construction contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To further define fraud in public construction contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-04-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-03-24 | House | House concurred |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Discharged to the Senate Committee on The Judiciary |
2013-10-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1478 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1478.pdf |