MA S1195 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2199
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to healthy cleaning products in schools. Public Health.
Title
Relative to healthy schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2199 |
2015-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S1056 (Similar To) 2016-07-12 - New draft substituted, see S2408
S1016 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S321 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S1125 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
S1157 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
H426 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
S1100 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1800 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied H2904
S1056 (Similar To) 2016-07-12 - New draft substituted, see S2408
S1016 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S321 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S1125 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
S1157 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
H426 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
S1100 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1800 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied H2904
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1195 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1195.pdf |