MA H67 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-16 - Joint session held and dissolved
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-16 - Joint session held and dissolved
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the subject matter of initiative petitions. The Judiciary.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution relative to the subject matter of initiative petitions
Sponsors
Rep. Byron Rushing [D] | Rep. Martha Walz [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Frank Smizik [D] |
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Geoff Diehl [R] |
Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Joint | Joint session held and dissolved |
2014-03-12 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, July 16, 2014 |
2013-10-09 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, March 12, 2014 |
2013-05-08 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, October 9, 2013 |
2013-05-06 | House | Called for consideration in the joint session |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on file |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on file |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass |
2013-03-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H67 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H67.pdf |