MA H4548 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2585
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Jose Lopez, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Jose Lopez, an employee of the Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-03-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-03-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-03-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-03-19 | House | Accompanied by S2585 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2585 (Replaces) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied H4548
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4548 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4548.pdf |