MA H4548 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 495 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 495 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant to the town of Belchertown a certain parcel of land in the town of Belchertown By Mr. Petrolati of Ludlow, a petition of Thomas M. Petrolati (by vote of the town) that the Commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to convey a certain parcel of land in the town of Belchertown to said town. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant to the town of Belchertown a certain parcel of land in the town of Belchertown
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 495 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-01-06 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Read |
2015-01-06 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-12-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-12-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-12-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-12-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-12-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4548 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4548.pdf |