MA H4510 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 25, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 25, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Methuen be authorized to raise the maximum retirement age of special police officers in said city to 70 years old. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing raising the maximum retirement age of special police officers in the city of Methuen to 70 years old
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 25, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/17/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2416 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2024
H4141 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3730 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3931
H3930 (Similar To) 2024-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3931 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4141 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3730 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3931
H3930 (Similar To) 2024-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3931 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4510 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4510.pdf |