MA H4457 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Massport climate resiliency trust fund to be funded by a portion of jet fuel excise taxes. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a Massport Climate Resiliency Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-04-16 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Revenue |
2024-04-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-16 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4143 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4632 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4655 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Passed to be engrossed - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY, No. 123)
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4632 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4655 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Passed to be engrossed - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY, No. 123)
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4457 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4457.pdf |