MA H4455 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement classification of certain employees of the city of Beverly. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the retirement classification of certain employees of the city of Beverly
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3747 (Similar To) 2023-09-14 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4093
H4093 (Similar To) 2023-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2023
H2857 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3400 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S2263
H4093 (Similar To) 2023-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2023
H2857 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3400 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S2263
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4455 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4455.pdf |