MA H4431 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Boston be authorized to appoint Nuias Daveiga a police officer in said city notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Directing the city of Boston Police Department to waive the maximum age requirement for police officers for Nuias Daveiga
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3844 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2024
H2520 (Similar To) 2023-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2023
H2520 (Similar To) 2023-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4431 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4431.pdf |