MA H3697 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to renewable energy production technologies. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to renewable energy production technologies
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Elliott [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Ryan Hamilton [D] | Rep. Adrianne Ramos [D] |
Rep. Frank Moran [D] | Rep. Estela Reyes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2129 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
H3148 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
S2159 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
S2529 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2558 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
H3148 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
S2159 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
S2529 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2558 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3697 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3697.pdf |