MA H3676 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the provisions of the bottle bill, so-called. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To update the bottle bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3534 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1908 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4441
H1105 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4198 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4441 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1908 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4441
H1105 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4198 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4441 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3676 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3676.pdf |