MA H3676 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4469
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - New draft substituted, see H4469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - New draft substituted, see H4469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Representation by the Attorney General in actions involving pilots
Title
Relative to representation by the Attorney General in actions involving pilots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | New draft substituted, see H4469 | |
2010-02-04 | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) | |
2010-02-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | |
2010-02-04 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new bill with the same title, see H4469 | |
2010-01-06 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4469 (Replaced by) 2010-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2010
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H3676 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=5697&generalCourtId=2 |