MA H3642 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the transfer of certain parcels of land in the town of Littleton By Representative Arciero of Westford and Senator Eldridge, a joint petition of James Arciero and James B. Eldridge (by vote of the town) that the town of Littleton be authorized to convey a certain parcel of land in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the transfer of certain parcels of land in the town of Littleton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #226 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2013-11-20 | House | Enacted 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 269) |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-10-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-09-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3642 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3642.pdf |