MA H3003 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelativerelative to autism spectrum disorders. Transportation.
Title
Establishing an autism spectrum disorder designation on driver’s licenses and identification cards and criminal justice training relative to autism spectrum disorders
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Andrews [D] | Rep. James Arciero [D] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Gloria Fox [D] |
Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Cleon Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4443 |
2013-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4443 (Replaced by) 2014-09-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3003 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3003.pdf |