MA H2780 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation has been replaced by H4143

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relativerelative to the collection of certain fees. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the enhancement of regional services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-04HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4143
2014-02-26JointHearing scheduled for 03/04/2014 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2013-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2013-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H4143 (Replaced by) 2014-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback