MA H2758 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expanding the senior property tax exemption. Revenue.
Title
Expanding the senior property tax exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Carol Doherty [D] |
Rep. James Arena-DeRosa [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Aaron Saunders [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H93 (Similar To) 2024-01-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2579
H1929 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied S1193
H1972 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H2193 (Similar To) 2023-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H3915 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2473
H1929 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied S1193
H1972 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H2193 (Similar To) 2023-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H3915 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2473
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2758 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2758.pdf |