MA H2461 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retirement for municipal building officials. Public Service.
Title
Relative to municipal building officials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2769 (Similar To) 2024-05-10 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2769 (Similar To) 2024-05-10 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2461 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2461.pdf |