MA H2398 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to access to parole. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To promote equitable access to parole
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1544 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
S1481 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H1471 (Similar To) 2023-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1481 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H1471 (Similar To) 2023-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2398 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2398.pdf |