MA H2394 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the right of persons incarcerated in correctional institutions, state prisons, jails or houses of correction to confer with news media representative. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To improve transparency and accountability in correctional facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H439 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4417
H3120 (Similar To) 2023-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H633 (Similar To) 2023-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1548 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H2851 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H3120 (Similar To) 2023-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H633 (Similar To) 2023-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1548 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H2851 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2394 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2394.pdf |