MA H2363 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the sale, transfer, or possession of large capacity ammunition gun feeding devices. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To close the large capacity magazine loophole
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2360 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
S1492 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H2312 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
S1492 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H2312 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2363 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2363.pdf |