MA H2142 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to mandate the installation of barriers between certain parking spaces and retail establishments. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to parking lots.
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4447 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 15, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-04-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4447 (Replaced by) 2014-09-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2142 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2142.pdf |