MA H182 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representatives Higgins of Leominster and Meschino of Hull, a petition of Natalie M. Higgins, Joan Meschino and Colleen M. Garry that the Department of Children and Families be authorized to develop a bias-free case review team to screen proposed emergency child removals. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to bias-free child removals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S102 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2645
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H182 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H182.pdf |