MA H1752 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4498
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to prevailing wages. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to prevailing wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4498 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-07-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, August 1, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-11-18 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4498 (Replaced by) 2014-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1752 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1752.pdf |