MA H156 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the powers of the Child Advocate to appear, intervene in or bring actions on behalf the Commonwealth. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Empowering the office of the child advocate to enforce its statutory duties
Sponsors
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 2, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S1000 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
S92 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4391
H162 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4391
H4391 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S92 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4391
H162 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4391
H4391 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H156 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H156.pdf |