MA H1366 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2165
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to uniform adult guardianship. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to uniform adult guardianship and protective proceedings jurisdiction
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] |
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Sen. Katherine Clark [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2165 |
2014-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2165 (Replaced by) 2014-07-10 - New draft substituted, see S2249
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1366 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1366.pdf |