MA H1145 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4211
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to operations at local housing authorities. Housing.
Title
To further enhance efficiency and accountability of operations at local housing authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4211 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 18, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, May 28, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2014-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Robertson on the River |
2014-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Springfield State Office Building |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4211 (Replaced by) 2014-07-14 - New draft substituted, see H4306
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1145 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1145.pdf |