MA H1134 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/17/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/17/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to testing for Factor V Leiden. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to testing for Factor V Leiden
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-16 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/17/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-10-03 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1134 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1134.pdf |