LA SB89 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the creation of the Delmont Neighborhood Crime Prevention District. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for the creation of the Delmont Neighborhood Crime Prevention District. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Cleo Fields [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 89 FINAL PASSAGE (#170) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |