LA SB593 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 766.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the Viable and Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act. (8/1/12)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the Viable and Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act. (8/1/12)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-17 Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 766.
2012-05-16 Reported by substitute.
2012-03-12 Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2012-03-02 Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback