LA SB276 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the crime of coerced criminal abortion by means of fraud to prohibit a third-party from knowingly using an abortion-inducing drug to cause, or attempt to cause, an abortion on an unsuspecting pregnant mother without her knowledge or consent and amends various abortion criminal laws to add the crime of attempted abortion. (gov sig) (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the crime of coerced criminal abortion by means of fraud to prohibit a third-party from knowingly using an abortion-inducing drug to cause, or attempt to cause, an abortion on an unsuspecting pregnant mother without her knowledge or consent and amends various abortion criminal laws to add the crime of attempted abortion. (gov sig) (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 276 CO-AUTHORS (#302) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 276 FINAL PASSAGE (#301) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 276 FINAL PASSAGE (#301) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |